Prasad v. Providence Health & Services - Washington et al
Plaintiff: Madhu Prasad, M.D.
Defendant: Preston Simmons and Providence Health & Services - Washington d/b/a Providence Alaska Medical Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00010
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: An answer has not been filed by defendant, Preston Simmons. Where the time to answer has expired, require an answer immediately or apply for default within 21 days from the date of this minute order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Notice of Proof of Service as to Defendant Preston Simmons by Madhu Prasad, M.D. re #12 Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix Rule 4f Affidavit of Service filed in state court)(Ingaldson, William)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 2/3/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/7/2022. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/25/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: IMPORTANT REMINDER. Proof of service as to Preston Simmons is lacking. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service is to be accomplished within 90 days from the filing of the complaint. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tavella, Anne)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Providence Health & Services - Washington.(Hodes, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed and ACCEPTS the Parties Stipulation Re Extension of Time to File Answer at docket #6 . The Answer to the Complaint shall be filed no later than 2/8/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Providence Health & Services - Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H)(Hodes, Elizabeth)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Providence Health & Services - Washington (Hodes, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodes, Elizabeth)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/21/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/21/2021) (JLH, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT of Corporate Disclosure by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Hodes, Elizabeth)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Tavella, Anne)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Providence Health & Services - Washington from Alaska Court System, case number 3AN-20-09778CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3004528), filed by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Tavella, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prasad v. Providence Health & Services - Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madhu Prasad, M.D.
Represented By: William H. Ingaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services - Washington d/b/a Providence Alaska Medical Center
Represented By: Elizabeth Pifke Hodes
Represented By: Anne Marie Tavella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?