Morrison v. Providence Health & Services et al
Plaintiff: Ruth C. Morrison
Defendant: Kenneth Thomas, Providence Health & Services, Anchorage Fracture and Orthopedic Clinic, PC and John Lapkass
Case Number: 3:2021cv00022
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Sharon L. Gleason: Scheduling Conference held 3:38 p.m. to 3:49 p.m. on 3/31/2021. Court and counsel heard re corrected scheduling report #12 and parties request trial in mid-April of 2023. 10/31/2022 for close of expert discovery and 8/31/2022 for disclosing of experts. Parties to provide witnesses 45 days before the close of fact discovery on or before 9/15/2022. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Ty Farnsworth on behalf of Jeffrey Hilden Vance for plaintiff; Laura L. Farley; Timothy Joseph Lamb for the defendant; Sonja L. Reeves, Official Court Reporter. (IAH, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 SLG TEXT ORDER: A telephonic Scheduling Conference is scheduled for 3/31/2021 at 3:30 p.m. All parties shall participate telephonically by dialing 877-402-9753 (use access code 6288202#) from a landline telephone approximately five minutes before the scheduled hearing time. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 12, 2021 Filing 12 CORRECTED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vance, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/15/2021 to clarify docket text. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vance, Jeffrey)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Health & Services. (Farley, Laura)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/19/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Jury Demand by Anchorage Fracture and Orthopedic Clinic, PC, John Lapkass, Kenneth Thomas re #6 Answer to Complaint (Lamb, Timothy)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Lamb on behalf of Anchorage Fracture and Orthopedic Clinic, PC, John Lapkass, Kenneth Thomas (Lamb, Timothy)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Anchorage Fracture and Orthopedic Clinic, PC, John Lapkass, Kenneth Thomas.(Lamb, Timothy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Providence Health & Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Farley, Laura)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Providence Health & Services (Farley, Laura)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Farley, Laura)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Providence Health & Services from Anchorage Superior, case number 3AN-20-08566 CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3013993), filed by Providence Health & Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Farley, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Providence Health & Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Thomas
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: Laura L. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchorage Fracture and Orthopedic Clinic, PC
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lapkass
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth C. Morrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Hilden Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?