Northern Seas, Inc. et al v. F/V BOBBI DEE, Official Number 533344 et al
Plaintiff: Northern Seas, Inc. and F/V ALEUT MISTRESS, Official Number 627816
Defendant: Marilyn J. Dushkin, William N. Dushkin and F/V BOBBI DEE, Official Number 533344
Case Number: 3:2021cv00025
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Northern Seas, Inc., F/V ALEUT MISTRESS, Official Number 627816. All Defendants. (Foe, Daniel)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: IMPORTANT REMINDER-Proof of service as to one or more defendants is lacking. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service is to be accomplished within 90 days from the filing of the complaint. File proofs of service on those defendants already served. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel A.S. Foe, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel A. S. Foe. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3020865.) by F/V ALEUT MISTRESS, Official Number 627816, Northern Seas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Non-Eligible Attorney to Appear and Participate)(Foe, Daniel)
February 15, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Foe, Daniel)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3019184.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Foe, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Seas, Inc. et al v. F/V BOBBI DEE, Official Number 533344 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Seas, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel A.S. Foe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F/V ALEUT MISTRESS, Official Number 627816
Represented By: Daniel A.S. Foe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn J. Dushkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William N. Dushkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V BOBBI DEE, Official Number 533344
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?