Ketchikan Indian Community v. Cochran et al
Plaintiff: Ketchikan Indian Community
Defendant: Norris Cochran, Elizabeth Fowler and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00028
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, US DHHS on March 8, 2021, filed by Ketchikan Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Elizabeth Fowler, Acting Director, IHS on March 9, 2021, filed by Ketchikan Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Bryan Schroder, US Atty for District of Alaska on March 8, 2021, filed by Ketchikan Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Robert 'Monty' Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General, U.S. Dept. of Justice on March 10, 2021, filed by Ketchikan Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: IMPORTANT REMINDER - Proof of service as to one or more defendants is lacking. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service is to be accomplished within 90 days from the filing of the complaint. File proofs of service on those defendants already served. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case by Ketchikan Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case by Ketchikan Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Ketchikan Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2021 Summons Issued as to Norris Cochran, Elizabeth Fowler, U.S. Attorney and Acting U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Norris Cochran, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Elizabeth Fowler, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Acting U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case by Ketchikan Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Ketchikan Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3018891.), filed by Ketchikan Indian Community.(Strommer, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketchikan Indian Community v. Cochran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ketchikan Indian Community
Represented By: Stephen D. Osborne
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?