Eclips v. Cass et al
Plaintiff: Luna Eclips
Defendant: Terry Lapka, Tammi Patterson, Robert Hall, Wallace Cass, Nancy Dahlstrom, Doreen Kitler, T Jaime, Sheri Olson, Heather and Garris
Case Number: 3:2021cv00038
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Luna Eclips. Filing fee $ 505/Not Paid. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), with prejudice. This dismissal constitutes a STRIKE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/5/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL:This case is DISMISSED under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B), with prejudice. This dismissal constitutes a STRIKE under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). All outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter a final judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/5/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/5/2021 to correct case number.) (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 JMK TEXT ORDER:By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:21-cv-00038-RRB. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Identify Full Name to Plaintiff by Luna Eclips.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel 'Stand-by Counsel' at public expense by Luna Eclips.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 Letter received on 2/25/21 from Luna Eclips. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Ex A and Ex B by Luna Eclips re #1 Complaint. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT by Luna Eclips re #1 Complaint. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luna Eclips. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wallace Cass, Nancy Dahlstrom, Garris, Robert Hall, Heather, T Jaime, Doreen Kitler, Terry Lapka, Sheri Olson, Tammi Patterson, filed by Luna Eclips. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eclips v. Cass et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luna Eclips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Lapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Cass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Dahlstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Kitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?