Beltz v. M&C Hotel Interests, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greg Beltz
Defendant: M&C Hotel Interests, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00039
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Nenni, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 3/17/2021. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by M&C Hotel Interests, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Online Docket Report)(Nenni, David)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by M&C Hotel Interests, Inc. (Nenni, David)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by M&C Hotel Interests, Inc..(Nenni, David)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by M&C Hotel Interests, Inc. from Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-21-04165. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3021837), filed by M&C Hotel Interests, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Certified State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Edward Rohling, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nenni, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltz v. M&C Hotel Interests, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Beltz
Represented By: Ashley Katherine Sundquist
Represented By: Thomas V. Wang, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&C Hotel Interests, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Nenni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?