Wright et al v. Knopp et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Elaine Wright and Christopher Joel Wright
Defendant: High Adventure Air Charter guides and Outfitters, Inc., Sandra Bell, Helen Knopp individually and d/b/a G&H Construction, Helen Knopp, Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC and Cindy Lynn Rainey-Bell
Case Number: 3:2021cv00049
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against High Adventure Air Charter guides and Outfitters, Inc., Cindy Lynn Rainey-Bell by Helen Knopp(individually and d/b/a G&H Construction), Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Knopp, deceased).(Gilman, Blaine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine D. Gilman on behalf of Helen Knopp(individually and d/b/a G&H Construction), Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Knopp, deceased) (Gilman, Blaine)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew S. Sims, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2021 Docket Annotation: ERROR re #11 Additional Related Document : Wrong event selected; Correction: Attorney to refile using the event Notice of Appearance. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury by Helen Knopp(individually and d/b/a G&H Construction), Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Knopp, deceased).(Gilman, Blaine)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Entry of Appearance by Blaine Gilman by Helen Knopp(individually and d/b/a G&H Construction), Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Knopp, deceased). (Gilman, Blaine)
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Joel Wright, Cynthia Elaine Wright. Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Harber, Amanda)
March 26, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Joel Wright, Cynthia Elaine Wright. Sandra Bell waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Harber, Amanda)
March 26, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Joel Wright, Cynthia Elaine Wright. High Adventure Air Charter guides and Outfitters, Inc. waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Harber, Amanda)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Joel Wright, Cynthia Elaine Wright. Helen Knopp(individually and d/b/a G&H Construction) waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021; Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Knopp, deceased) waiver sent on 3/8/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Harber, Amanda)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant Helen Knopp (KMC, COURT STAFF)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew Sims. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3040847.) by Christopher Joel Wright, Cynthia Elaine Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bar Admissions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Admission to Bar of Illinois)(Sims, Matthew)
March 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to Helen Knopp(individually and d/b/a G&H Construction), Helen Knopp(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gary Knopp, deceased). (KMC, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Harber, Amanda)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/8/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Harber, Amanda)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3029809.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Harber, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Knopp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Adventure Air Charter guides and Outfitters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Knopp individually and d/b/a G&H Construction
Represented By: Blaine D. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Knopp
Represented By: Blaine D. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soldotna Aircraft & Equipment Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Lynn Rainey-Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Elaine Wright
Represented By: Amanda Joy Harber
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Joel Wright
Represented By: Amanda Joy Harber
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?