Brown v. Marshall et al
Plaintiff: Carl E. Brown
Defendant: Dean Marshall, Sherrie Daigle and Joseph Schmidt
Case Number: 3:2021cv00057
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 5/5/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Any outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 5/5/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Carl E. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Supreme Court Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Mr. Brown's Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee, at Docket #5 , is DEFERRED until Mr. Brown fully complies with this Order. Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/13/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Statement of Account by Carl E. Brown re #6 Order, #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE DEFICIENT FILING: Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this order to submit a statement of his prisoner trust account. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/26/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl E. Brown.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE DEFICIENT FILING: Plaintiff to file either the filing fee of $402.00 or an application to waive prepayment of the filing fee within 30 days of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/12/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Cause No. is changed from 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights to 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights and the Nature of Suit is changed from 380 Personal Property to 550 Prisoner: Civil Rights to reflect that this is a civil rights action filed by a prisoner. These changes are administrative in nature only. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherrie Daigle, Dean Marshall, Joseph Schmidt (Filing fee $ 5 - Receipt #ANC017707.), filed by Carl E. Brown.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie Daigle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?