Boom Boys Cranes, LLC v. Hamilton Construction, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Boom Boys Cranes, LLC
Defendant: Hamilton Construction, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00062
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boom Boys Cranes, LLC. Hamilton Construction, L.L.C. served on 4/29/2021, answer due 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service)(McLean, Donald)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Boom Boys Cranes, LLC. (McLean, Donald)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proof of service or status report within seven days. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boom Boys Cranes, LLC. (McLean, Donald)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/31/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2021 Summons Issued as to Hamilton Construction, L.L.C. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2021 Filing 7 Unissued summons re Defendant Hamilton Construction, LLC, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer M. Higgins, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew C. Crane, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jennifer M. Higgins. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3040051.) by Boom Boys Cranes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Higgins, Jennifer)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew C. Crane. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3040005.) by Boom Boys Cranes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Crane, Matthew)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (McLean, Donald)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Replevin against Hamilton Construction, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3039910.), filed by Boom Boys Cranes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLean, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boom Boys Cranes, LLC v. Hamilton Construction, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Construction, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boom Boys Cranes, LLC
Represented By: Donald K. McLean
Represented By: Matthew C. Crane
Represented By: Jennifer Milliman Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?