In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC
Petitioner: In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC
Cross Claimant: Mariel Ellingson, Daniel Carlsen and Gunnar Lassen
Cross Defendant: Michael Patitucci
Case Number: 3:2021cv00063
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint , ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Michael Patitucci, COUNTERCLAIM against In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC by Gunnar Lassen.(Jacobsen, James)
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint , ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Michael Patitucci, COUNTERCLAIM against In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC by Mariel Ellingson.(Jacobsen, James)
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Michael Patitucci, COUNTERCLAIM against In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC by Daniel Carlsen.(Jacobsen, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Stacey on behalf of Daniel Carlsen, Mariel Ellingson, Gunnar Lassen (Stacey, Joseph)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 4/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2022. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/5/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 3, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Claim for Damages .(Poulson, Jack) Modified on 5/4/2021 to clarify docket text. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Jeremy)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/7/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Jacobsen on behalf of Daniel Carlsen, Mariel Ellingson, Gunnar Lassen (Jacobsen, James)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Motion for Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, Publication Thereof, and Granting an Injunction Restraining the Prosecution of any Claims Arising Out of or in Connection with the August 15, 2020 Voyage of the Vessel Alaska Eagle. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/24/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION ORDER APPROVING SECURITY, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE, PUBLICATION THEREOF, AND GRANTING AN INJUNCTION RESTRAINING THE PROSECUTION OF ANY CLAIMS ARISING OUT OF OR IN CONNECTION WITH THE AUGUST 15, 2020 VOYAGE OF THE VESSEL ALASKA EAGLE by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT BOND UNDER RULE F OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL RULES OF ADMIRALTY AND MARITIME CLAIMS AND ASSET FORFEITURE ACTIONS by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC. (Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 Interim STIPULATION FOR VALUE by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC.(Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of JEREMY B. JONES by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC. (Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of CAPTAIN JOSEPH A. DERIE II DSc PE by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC. (Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC (Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC. (Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jones, Jeremy)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3039485.), filed by In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC.(Jones, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of the Complaint of Alaska Eagle LLC
Represented By: Jeremy B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Mariel Ellingson
Represented By: Joseph S. Stacey
Represented By: James P. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Daniel Carlsen
Represented By: Joseph S. Stacey
Represented By: James P. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Gunnar Lassen
Represented By: Joseph S. Stacey
Represented By: James P. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Michael Patitucci
Represented By: Jack G. Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?