Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation v. Arcadis U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation
Defendant: Arcadis U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00141
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant Arcadis U.S., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Arcadis U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(White, Jimmy)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Mandee Collins (CT Corp RA for Arcadis U.S., Inc.) on June 18, 2021, filed by Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proof of Service)(Cuddy, Kevin)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Arcadis U.S., Inc. answer due 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/7/21. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Arcadis U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Jimmy)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jimmy E. White on behalf of Arcadis U.S., Inc. (White, Jimmy)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant Arcadis U.S., Inc., (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Arcadis U.S., Inc. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark P. Walters, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Mark P. Walters. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3086654.) by Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation.(Cuddy, Kevin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation. (Cuddy, Kevin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Cuddy, Kevin)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement (35 U.S.C. 1 et. seq.) Jury Demand against Arcadis U.S., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3086643.), filed by Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 US7399141 (the '141 Patent))(Cuddy, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation v. Arcadis U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Jimmy E. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brice Environmental ServicesCorporation
Represented By: Kevin M. Cuddy
Represented By: Mark P. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?