Aleck v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Virginia B. Aleck
Defendant: Alaska Native Medical Center, Dr. Benjamin A. Garnett and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00147
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0554
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virginia B. Aleck. United States of America served on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to T. Farnsworth. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Unissued summons re Defendant USA, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Garnett, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant ANMC)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to Alaska Native Medical Center, Benjamin A. Garnett, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Virginia B. Aleck against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3091517.), filed by Virginia B. Aleck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vance, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aleck v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Native Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Benjamin A. Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia B. Aleck
Represented By: Ty A. Farnsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?