State of Alaska v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Defendant: Deb Haaland, Laura Daniel-Davis, Chad Padgett and Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 3:2021cv00158
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' answer due 10/22/2021. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (UNOPPOSED) by Bureau of Land Management, Laura Daniel-Davis, Deb Haaland, Chad Padgett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boylan, Shannon)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Alaska re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued as to USA, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Ronald W. Opsahl. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3099947.), #2 Civil Cover Sheet , AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bryan Wilson, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deb Haaland, #4 Exhibit 4 - Laura Daniel-Davis, #5 Exhibit 5 - Chad Padgett, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bureau of Land Management)(Opsahl, Ronald)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service or state report by 8/6/2021. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Walter Opsahl, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Deb Haaland, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Laura Daniel-Davis, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Chad Padgett, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bureau of Land Management, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Ronald W. Opsahl. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3099947.) by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Opsahl, Ronald)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Opsahl, Ronald)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3099941.), filed by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Opsahl, Ronald)
July 7, 2021 Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, Laura Daniel-Davis, Deb Haaland, Chad Padgett, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Alaska v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: Ronald Walter Opsahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Shannon Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Daniel-Davis
Represented By: Shannon Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Padgett
Represented By: Shannon Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Shannon Boylan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?