Tugatuk v. Reigh et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Tugatuk
Defendant: Christina L. Reigh, Ben Turner, Jerilyn T. Moore, Christopher S. Lesch, Kate Bargerhuff, Clerk of the Courts, Lance Christion Wells, William Vitkus, Allen Jackson and Craig Markiewicz
Case Number: 3:2021cv00174
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 9 and 10, against Judge Christina Reigh, Attorneys Christopher Lesch, Kate Bargerhuff and Lance Wells, Prosecutor William Vitkus, and Ms. Jerilyn Moore are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/23/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Claims 1, 3, 4, 6, 9 and 10, against Judge Christina Reigh, Attorneys Christopher Lesch, Kate Bargerhuff and Lance Wells, Prosecutor William Vitkus, and Ms. Jerilyn Moore are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee, at Docket #6 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a Judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/20/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Geoffrey Tugatuk. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Kate Bargerhuff, Clerk of the Courts, Allen Jackson, Christopher S. Lesch, Craig Markiewicz, Jerilyn T. Moore, Christina L. Reigh, Ben Turner, William Vitkus, Lance Christion Wells, filed by Geoffrey Tugatuk.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DEFICIENT FILING: Complaint and Application to Waive Prepayment of Filing Fee or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due 9/7/2021. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/3/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 RRB TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00174-RRB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Notice of Intent to File Suit/Lein against Kate Bargerhuff, Clerk of the Courts, Allen Jackson, Christopher S. Lesch, Craig Markiewicz, Jerilyn T. Moore, Christina L. Reigh, Ben Turner, William Vitkus, Lance Christion Wells, filed by Geoffrey Tugatuk.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tugatuk v. Reigh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Tugatuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina L. Reigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerilyn T. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S. Lesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Bargerhuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Courts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Christion Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Vitkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Markiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?