Alaska Wildlife Alliance et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Friends of the Earth and Sierra Club
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of Interior, Shannon Estenoz and Debra Haaland
Intervenor Defendant: Alaska Oil and Gas Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv00209
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 3371
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Feldman on behalf of Alaska Oil and Gas Association (Feldman, James)
November 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T Morgan on behalf of Alaska Oil and Gas Association (Morgan, Jason)
November 3, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alaska Oil and Gas Association.(Steen, Ryan)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Intervene. AOGA shall file a clean copy of its Answer within 7 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/2/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 1, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Oil and Gas Association. (Steen, Ryan)
November 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene (Unopposed) by Alaska Oil and Gas Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kara Moriarty, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Proposed Order)(Steen, Ryan)
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Environment America, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Friends of the Earth, Alaska Wilderness League. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Department of the Interior Summons, #2 Affidavit Shannon Estenoz Summons, #3 Affidavit Debra Haaland Summons, #4 Receipt of Service AUSA)(Psarianos, Bridget)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristen Monsell, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karimah Schoenhut, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 JMK ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00209-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 HRH TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is hereby reassigned to Judge Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:21-cv-00209-JMK. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 JWS TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been randomly reassigned to the Hon. H. Russel Holland. Henceforth the case number will be 3:21-cv-00209-HRH. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kristen Monsell. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3134249.) by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate)(Monsell, Kristen)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Department of Interior, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant S. Estenoz, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant D. Haaland, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Fish and Wildlife Services)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karimah Schoenhut. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number 097--3133918.) by Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Good Standing Certificate)(Schoenhut, Karimah)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Friends of the Earth, Sierra Club. (Psarianos, Bridget)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Psarianos, Bridget)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3133896.), filed by Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Environment America, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Friends of the Earth, Alaska Wilderness League.(Psarianos, Bridget)
September 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to Shannon Estenoz, Debra Haaland, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of Interior, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Wildlife Alliance et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wildlife Alliance
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Joanna L. Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Joanna L. Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Kristen Angela Monsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Joanna L. Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environment America
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Joanna L. Cahoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Kristen Angela Monsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Joanna L. Cahoon
Represented By: Karimah Schoenhut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Estenoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Alaska Oil and Gas Association
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Represented By: James C. Feldman
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?