Nordlund v. Neace et al
Plaintiff: David Nordlund
Defendant: Colin Neace, Brandon Schaefer, Anchorage Police Department and Municipality of Anchorage
Case Number: 3:2021cv00230
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Municipality of Anchorage. (Weiss, Pamela)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Nordlund re #10 MOTION for Request for Service by U.S. Marshalls and for the Court to Post a Request for the Assistance of Counsel, #9 Response Answer to Order to Show Cause. (SXH, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION of Request for Service by U.S. Marshalls and for the Court to Post a Request for the Assistance of Counsel by David Nordlund. (SXH, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE Answer TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by David Nordlund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1).(SXH, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this Order to submit briefing as to whether Heck v. Humphrey bars his claims under 42 U.S.C. 1983. Defendants shall have 21 days to respond from Plaintiff's submission. In the event Plaintiff does not file briefing, Defendants shall have 30 days to file from Plaintiff's deadline. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 11/2/2021. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Anchorage Police Department, Municipality of Anchorage (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Weiss, Pamela)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Anchorage Police Department, Municipality of Anchorage (Weiss, Pamela)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Anchorage Police Department, Municipality of Anchorage.(Weiss, Pamela)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Municipality of Anchorage, Anchorage Police Department from Alaska State Court, case number 3AN-21-05098-CI. ( Filing fee $ 402), filed by Municipality of Anchorage, Anchorage Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordlund v. Neace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nordlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Neace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchorage Police Department
Represented By: Pamela D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Represented By: Pamela D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?