Boston et al v. Norman et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Boston and Donna Boston
Defendant: Shawn Norman, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers, John Does 1-10 and Crossroads Health Ministries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00276
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Filing 13 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska State Troopers. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 17, 2022 Summons Issued as to The Alaska State Troopers. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion to Continue Proceedings for 45 Days. Status Report due by 4/1/2022. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/15/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #9 Joint MOTION to Continue Proceedings for 45 Days filed by Crossroads Health Ministries, Inc.. (Gerlach, Scott)
February 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Gerlach on behalf of Crossroads Health Ministries, Inc. (Gerlach, Scott)
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Proceedings for 45 Days by Donna Boston, Jordan Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to accompany Joint Motion and Memorandum)(Wiederholt, Jon)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Shawn Norman, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Franklin, Adam)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 1/20/22. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2022 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Shawn Norman, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers.(Franklin, Adam)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Reuben Franklin on behalf of Shawn Norman, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers (Franklin, Adam)
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Shawn Norman, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers (Franklin, Adam)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Franklin, Adam)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Does 1-10, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers, Shawn Norman from Superior Court of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-21-07437CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--3183326), filed by John Does 1-10, Jason Somerville, The Alaska State Troopers, Shawn Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Franklin, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston et al v. Norman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Boston
Represented By: Jon E. Wiederholt
Represented By: Jon Engle Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Boston
Represented By: Jon E. Wiederholt
Represented By: Jon Engle Wiederholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Norman
Represented By: Adam Reuben Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Somerville
Represented By: Adam Reuben Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alaska State Troopers
Represented By: Adam Reuben Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Adam Reuben Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Health Ministries, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Reuben Franklin
Represented By: Scott J. Gerlach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?