Blakeley v. Gunderson et al
Plaintiff: Barry Blakeley
Defendant: Daniel G. Gunderson, Christopher Rafferty, Timothy Wolff and Thomas V. Jamgochian
Case Number: 3:2022cv00035
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE by Barry Blakeley. Christopher Rafferty served on 4/12/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Daniel G. Gunderson, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Christopher Rafferty, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Thomas V. Jamgochian, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Timothy Wolff)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2022 Summons Issued as to Daniel G. Gunderson, Thomas V. Jamgochian, Christopher Rafferty, Timothy Wolff. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Daniel G. Gunderson, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Christopher Rafferty, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Timothy Wolff, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Thomas V. Jamgochian)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel G. Gunderson, Thomas V. Jamgochian, Christopher Rafferty, Timothy Wolff (Filing fee $402/Receipt #ANC018756.), filed by Barry Blakeley.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeley v. Gunderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Blakeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. Jamgochian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?