Baum v. Quinn
Plaintiff: Robert T. Baum
Defendant: Dan Quinn
Case Number: 3:2022cv00069
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTEMPT TO CONFER WITH PLAINTIFF REGARDING SCHEDULING AND PLANNING REPORT by Dan Quinn re #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilmore, Chester)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gilmore, Chester)
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to File Electronically by Robert T. Baum.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Dan Quinn re #9 Additional Related Document by Dan Quinn. (Gilmore, Chester)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 Opposition to Motion by Dan Quinn re #8 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilmore, Chester) Modified on 4/18/2022 to clarify docket text. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 Motion re Notice of Removal by Robert T. Baum re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 4/18/2022 to change to motion event. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for defendant shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/4/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Dan Quinn.(Gilmore, Chester)
March 25, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Dan Quinn (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons)(Gilmore, Chester)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Dan Quinn (Gilmore, Chester)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Gilmore, Chester)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dan Quinn from Superior Court at Palmer Alaska, case number 3PA-22-01151CI. ( Filing fee $ 402), filed by Dan Quinn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gilmore, Chester)
March 25, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ANC018849 (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baum v. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Quinn
Represented By: Chester DeMott Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?