Smith et al v. Helzer et al
Plaintiff: Doug Smith, Robert Griffin, Allen Vezey, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Families of the Last Frontier and Alaska Free Market Coalition
Defendant: Anne Helzer, Van Lawrence, Richard Stillie, Jr, Suzanne Hancock, Dan LaSota and Lanette Blodgett
Intervenor Defendant: Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00077
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alaska Free Market Coalition, Families of the Last Frontier, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey. (Richards, Craig) Modified on 6/1/2022 to link to dkt 18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SLG TEXT ORDER: In light of the parties request in their Scheduling and Planning Conference Report at Docket #28 , a Scheduling and Planning Order will not be issued by the Court at this time. Within 7 days of the Courts ruling on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Docket #18 , the Motion to Dismiss at Docket #31 and the Motion to Dismiss at Docket #33 , the parties shall jointly file a status report to update the Court regarding further proceedings in this matter. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SLG TEXT ORDER: Intervenor-Defendant Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.s Motion to Accept Over-Length Brief at Docket #32 is GRANTED. The filing at Docket #33 is ACCEPTED as filed. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendants Unopposed Motion to File Overlength Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Docket #29 is GRANTED. The brief at Docket #30 is ACCEPTED as filed. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Notice to Counsel re #31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #30 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Anne Helzer. A review of the documents submitted at dkt 30 and 31 confirm they are over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the documents have not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filings at dkt 30 and 31. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Intervenor-Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintifs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Kendall, Scott)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Scott M. Kendall)(Kendall, Scott)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Accept Over-Length Brief)(Kendall, Scott)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Anne Helzer.(Alloway, Jessica)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anne Helzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fox, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to File Overlength Opposition to Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Anne Helzer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fox, Laura)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Richards, Craig)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond at Docket #25 is GRANTED. Intervenor-Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond at Docket #26 is GRANTED. Defendant and Intervenor-Defendant's responses to the complaint are due May 16, 2022. Responses to the motion for a preliminary injunction are due May 16, 2022. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond by Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Scott)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond by Anne Helzer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Alloway, Jessica)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Briefing Schedule and Argument at Docket #20 is GRANTED. Defendants' response to the motion for preliminary injunction is due May 15, 2022. Plaintiffs' reply is due May 31, 2022. Oral argument on the motion at Docket #18 is scheduled for June 13, 2022, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2 before Judge Sharon L. Gleason. Each side will be allowed 20 minutes for oral argument. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura F. Fox on behalf of All Defendants (Fox, Laura)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Intervene. Answer due within 7 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/3/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ERRATA Corrected FLF Declaration #18-4 by Families of the Last Frontier #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Families of the Last Frontier, Trevor Shaw, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Alaska Free Market Coalition, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey. (Richards, Craig)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION Schedule re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Unopposed by Alaska Free Market Coalition, Families of the Last Frontier, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richards, Craig)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice to Counsel re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Families of the Last Frontier, Trevor Shaw, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Alaska Free Market Coalition, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey. A review of the document submitted at dkt 18 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 18. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Free Market Coalition, Families of the Last Frontier, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Griffin Declaration, #4 Affidavit FLF Declaration, #5 Affidavit Haynes Declaration, #6 Affidavit Shaw Declaration, #7 Affidavit Smith Declaration, #8 Affidavit Vezey Declaration)(Richards, Craig)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice to Counsel re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. A review of the document submitted at dkt 7 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 7. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/21/22. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation: Lanette Blodgett, Commissioner, Alaska Public Offices Commission, substituted for Van Lawrence (official capacities as members of the Alaska Public Offices Commissions) pursuant to FRCvP 25(d) (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SLG TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs Motion to Exceed Page Limits at Docket #8 is GRANTED. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction at Docket #7 is ACCEPTED as filed. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #6 MOTION to Intervene Defendants' Response to Motion to Intervene filed by Jessica Alloway State of Alaska, Attorney General's Office. (Alloway, Jessica)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE Notice of Substitution of Party by Jessica Alloway State of Alaska, Attorney General's Office (Alloway, Jessica)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Moats Alloway on behalf of Jessica Alloway State of Alaska, Attorney General's Office (Alloway, Jessica)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D. Rodgers on behalf of Kimberly Rodgers State of Alaska, Attorney General's Office (Rodgers, Kimberly)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice to Counsel re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. A review of the document submitted at dkt 7 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 7. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unissued summons re Defendant S. Hancock, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Helzer, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Stillie, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Lawrence, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant LaSota)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed by Alaska Free Market Coalition, Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc., Families of the Last Frontier, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey.(Richards, Craig)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Free Market Coalition, Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc., Families of the Last Frontier, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey.(Richards, Craig)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Suzanne Hancock, Anne Helzer, Dan LaSota, Van Lawrence, and Richard Stillie, Jr. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kendall, Scott)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Docket Annotation re #6 Motion to Intervene as Defendant: The parties are advised that the role of the proposed Intervenor Defendant has been changed from Intervenor Defendant to Movant until the Motion to Intervene has been decided. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel R. Suhr, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel R. Suhr. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3235276.) by Alaska Free Market Coalition, Families of the Last Frontier, Robert Griffin, Albert Haynes, Trevor Shaw, Doug Smith, Allen Vezey. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Richards, Craig)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JWS TEXT ORDER: The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. It has been randomly reassigned to Hon. Sharon L. Gleason. Henceforth, the case number will be 3:22-cv-00077-SLG.(RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Richards, Craig)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3234011.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Richards, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Helzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Smith
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Griffin
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Vezey
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Haynes
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Shaw
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Families of the Last Frontier
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Free Market Coalition
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Helzer
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Represented By: Kimberly D. Rodgers
Represented By: Laura F. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Lawrence
Represented By: Kimberly D. Rodgers
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stillie, Jr
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Represented By: Kimberly D. Rodgers
Represented By: Laura F. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Hancock
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Represented By: Kimberly D. Rodgers
Represented By: Laura F. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan LaSota
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Represented By: Kimberly D. Rodgers
Represented By: Laura F. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanette Blodgett
Represented By: Laura F. Fox
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Represented By: Kimberly D. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Alaskans for Better Elections, Inc.
Represented By: Jahna M. Lindemuth
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?