Bodo v. Angasan et al
Plaintiff: Gracie Bodo
Defendant: Brad Angasan, Renalda Angasan and F/V The Novarupta
Case Number: 3:2023cv00035
Filed: February 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Merriam, John)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/30/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SLG TEXT ORDER: In light of counsel for defendants' appearance on March 27, 2023 at Docket #20 and the Answer at Docket #18 filed on March 27, 2023, Plaintiff's Motion for Default at Docket #17 is DENIED as moot. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen Shortell on behalf of Brad Angasan, Renalda Angasan, F/V The Novarupta (Shortell, Owen)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Brad Angasan, Renalda Angasan, F/V The Novarupta. (Shortell, Owen)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Shortell, Owen)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default by Gracie Bodo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proposed Order)(Merriam, John)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER - CASE NOT AT ISSUE: An answer has not been filed by one or more defendants served in this case. Where the time to answer has expired, require an answer immediately or apply for default within 21 days. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SLG TEXT ORDER: The telephonic Status Conference on March 7, 2023 is VACATED and will be rescheduled in due course. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Merriam, at docket #13 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney John W. Merriam. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3399855.) by Gracie Bodo. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merriam, John)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SLG TEXT ORDER: A telephonic Status Conference is scheduled for March 7, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. All parties shall participate telephonically by dialing 571-353-2301 (Call ID 020262828, Pin 487051) approximately five minutes before the scheduled hearing time. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:22-cv-01377. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Case transferred to the District of Alaska by electronic case transfer on 2/21/2023. (SB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #8 Motion to Transfer Case. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Alaska for resolution. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UPDATED STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Plaintiff Gracie Bodo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/23/2023, (Merriam, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Renalda Angasan on 12/1/2022, filed by Plaintiff Gracie Bodo. (Merriam, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Brad Angasan on 12/1/2022, filed by Plaintiff Gracie Bodo. (Merriam, John) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court thus ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute within 14 days of this Order. Failure to respond will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Brad Angasan, Renalda Angasan. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Lauren King added. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gracie Bodo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Praecipe)(Merriam, John) (Prepayment Waived) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodo v. Angasan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gracie Bodo
Represented By: John W. Merriam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Angasan
Represented By: Owen Shortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renalda Angasan
Represented By: Owen Shortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V The Novarupta
Represented By: Owen Shortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?