Gutierrez Castaneda v. State of Alaska et al
Plaintiff: Ada Gabi Gutierrez Castaneda
Defendant: State of Alaska, Alaska Marine Highway System, Rafael Soto and M/V Matanuska (I.MO. 5228827)
Case Number: 3:2023cv00065
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1101 Violation of Maritime Regulations
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 14 DEFENDANT RAFAEL SOTO'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Case Status: The order of April 5, 2023 referring case to Chief Magistrate Judge Scoble is withdrawn. Defendant Soto's response to plaintiff's complaint is due on May 18, 2023. It appears that the State of Alaska has not served or filed a timely response to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/17/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2023 Filing 12 Unissued summons re Defendant State of Alaska, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2023 Summons Issued as to State of Alaska. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2023 Filing 11 JMK TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:23-cv-00065-HRH-MMS. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on State of Alaska (AMHS) on April 4, 2023, filed by Ada Gabi Gutierrez Castaneda. (Deitz, Adam)
May 12, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rafael Soto on April 8, 2023, filed by Ada Gabi Gutierrez Castaneda. (Deitz, Adam)
April 26, 2023 Filing 8 MMS TEXT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer #7 as to Rafael Soto. Answer due 5/18/2023. (ACW, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 26, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Rafael Soto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nesbett, Michelle)
April 5, 2023 Filing 6 JMK TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Chief Magistrate Judge Matthew M. Scoble pursuant to LMJR 2, authority of a magistrate judge, and 5, civil matters routinely assigned. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret, at docket #4 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3420276.) by Ada Gabi Gutierrez Castaneda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant State of Alaska - Juneau, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant State of Alaska Anchorage, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Soto)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2023 Summons Issued as to Alaska Marine Highway System, M/V Matanuska (I.MO. 5228827), Rafael Soto, State of Alaska. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Deitz, Adam)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3415540.), filed by Ada Gabi Gutierrez Castaneda.(Deitz, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez Castaneda v. State of Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Gabi Gutierrez Castaneda
Represented By: Adam Deitz
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Marine Highway System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Soto
Represented By: Michelle Nesbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Matanuska (I.MO. 5228827)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?