Orutsararmiut Native Council et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Orutsararmiut Native Council, Tuluksak Native Community and Organized Village of Kwethluk
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, Colonel Damon Delarosa, Laura Daniel-Davis and Steven Cohn
Petitioner: Calista Corporation
Intervenor Defendant: Donlin Gold LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00071
Filed: April 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4332 Environmental Policy - Coop of Agency Repo
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Organized Village of Kwethluk, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Tuluksak Native Community. (Tavepholjalern, Maile)
May 17, 2023 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Donlin Gold LLC.(Rumsey, Allison)
May 16, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene by Calista Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Guy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Calista Corp's Proposed Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #5 Proposed Order)(Singer, Matthew)
May 16, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Singer on behalf of Calista Corporation (Singer, Matthew)
May 16, 2023 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ethan G. Shenkman, at docket #7 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE JUDGE GLEASON'S CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/12/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Intervene. A clean copy of its Answer(Docket 8-2) shall be filed within seven days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/11/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 10, 2023 Filing 12 JMK TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Chief Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Henceforth, parties to use the following case caption for all future filings in 3:23-cv-00071-SLG. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allison B. Rumsey, at docket #6 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (SCD, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Department of the Interior, Colonel Damon Delarosa, Laura Daniel-Davis, Stephen Cohn, Merrick B. Garland, and S. Lane Tucker on April 5, 2023, filed by Organized Village of Kwethluk, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Tuluksak Native Community. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Payne, Hannah)
May 8, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Organized Village of Kwethluk, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Tuluksak Native Community. (Payne, Hannah)
April 27, 2023 Receipt of $250.00 non-resident attorney payment (Receipt #100020101 for Allison Rumsey as to Intervenor-Defendant Donlin Gold LLC. re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Allison B. Rumsey (BJK, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2023 Receipt of $250.00 non-resident attorney payment (Receipt #100020100) for Ethan G. Shenkman as to Intervenor-Defendant Donlin Gold LLC. re #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Ethan G. Shenkman (BJK, COURT STAFF)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Donlin Gold LLC. (Fjelstad, Eric)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene by Donlin Gold LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dan Graham, #2 Supplement Donlin's Proposed Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Donlin Gold LLC's Motion to Intervene)(Fjelstad, Eric)
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Ethan G. Shenkman by Donlin Gold LLC.(Fjelstad, Eric)
April 24, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Allison B. Rumsey by Donlin Gold LLC.(Fjelstad, Eric)
April 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fjelstad on behalf of Donlin Gold LLC (Fjelstad, Eric)
April 6, 2023 Filing 4 HRH TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:23-cv-00071-JMK. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2023 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Tucker, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Garland, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant DOI, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Delarosa, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Daniel-Davis, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Cohn, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant BLM, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant Army Corps)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Payne, Hannah)
April 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Cohn, Laura Daniel-Davis, Damon Delarosa, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3420687.), filed by Organized Village of Kwethluk, Orutsararmiut Native Council, Tuluksak Native Community.(Payne, Hannah) Modified on 4/5/2023 to correct spelling (LMH, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2023 Summons Issued as to Steven Cohn, Laura Daniel-Davis, Damon Delarosa, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of Interior, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orutsararmiut Native Council et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orutsararmiut Native Council
Represented By: Hannah Payne
Represented By: Maile Sinn Fong Tavepholjalern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuluksak Native Community
Represented By: Hannah Payne
Represented By: Maile Sinn Fong Tavepholjalern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organized Village of Kwethluk
Represented By: Hannah Payne
Represented By: Maile Sinn Fong Tavepholjalern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Damon Delarosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Daniel-Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Donlin Gold LLC
Represented By: Allison B. Rumsey
Represented By: Eric B. Fjelstad
Represented By: Ethan G. Shenkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Calista Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?