Horvath v. Triumvirate, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Horvath
Defendant: Triumvirate, LLC, Michael Rheam and Spurr Mountain, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00099
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney Fees Following Remand by David Horvath. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel)(Knutson, Tracey)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JOINDER TO MOTION Spurr Mountain LLC's Joinder in Triumvirate, LLC's Notice of Removal by Spurr Mountain, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John J. Tiemessen in Support of Defendatns Triumvirate's Notice of Removal and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Tiemessen, John)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/20/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/20/2023 to regenerate NEF for atty Tiemessen. (RMC, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss by Spurr Mountain, LLC re #9 Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Tiemessen, John) Modified on 6/20/2023 to regenerate NEF. Atty notice set to "no". (RMC, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JOINDER TO MOTION Joinder in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Spurr Mountain, LLC #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Triumvirate, LLC. (Tiemessen, John) Modified on 6/20/2023 to regenerate NEF. Atty notice set to "no". (RMC, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tiemessen on behalf of Spurr Mountain, LLC (Tiemessen, John) Modified on 6/20/2023 to regenerate NEF. Atty notice set to "no". (RMC, COURT STAFF).
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lamb, Timothy)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by David Horvath. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Knutson, Tracey)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of John Tiemessen re #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Triumvirate, LLC. (Lamb, Timothy)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand . Replies due by 5/31/2023. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Triumvirate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy J. Lamb, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lamb, Timothy)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Dated May 24, 2023 at Docket #10 is GRANTED. The deadline for the response to the Plaintiffs Motion to Remand is extended to May 24, 2023.. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Remand Unopposed by Triumvirate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Timothy J. Lamb, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lamb, Timothy)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Triumvirate, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Lamb, Timothy)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Triumvirate, LLC (Lamb, Timothy)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by David Horvath. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Knutson, Tracey)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/4/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Hozubin on behalf of Spurr Mountain, LLC (Hozubin, Rebecca)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 HRH TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is administratively reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:23-cv-00099-SLG. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Triumvirate, LLC from Superior Court of the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-23-05352 CI. ( Filing fee $ 402- Receipt 100020111), filed by Triumvirate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horvath v. Triumvirate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Horvath
Represented By: Tracey L. Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumvirate, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rheam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spurr Mountain, LLC
Represented By: John J. Tiemessen
Represented By: Rebecca J. Hozubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?