Banner Bank v. Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106 et al
Plaintiff: Banner Bank
Defendant: Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106, Fish Hawk, O.N. 652535, Kaktovik II, O.N. 623509, Logistics Provider, O.N. 645121, Madison Rose, O.N. 274325, Sea Hawk, O.N. 597336, Takotna River O.N. 1159276, Alaska Logistics, LLC and Allyn Long
Case Number: 3:2023cv00125
Filed: June 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Lafcadio Darling re #13 MOTION for Entry of Default on In Personam Defendant Allyn Long by Banner Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Darling, Lafcadio)
August 2, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default on In Personam Defendant Allyn Long by Banner Bank.(Darling, Lafcadio)
July 20, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Arrest Motion, Order & Docket Text re Warrant Issued; Motion, Declaration & Order re Substitute Custodian & Permission to Board served on Allyn Long on 7/11/2023, filed by Banner Bank. (Darling, Lafcadio)
July 18, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Arrest Motion, Order & Docket Text re Warrant Issued; Motion, Declaration & Order re Substitute Custodian & Permission to Board served on Allyn Long on 7/11/2023, filed by Banner Bank. (Darling, Lafcadio)
July 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Defendant Alaska Logistics LLC Bankruptcy Filing by Banner Bank (Darling, Lafcadio)
July 11, 2023 Filing 9 WARRANT of Arrest In Rem Returned Unexecuted as to Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106, Fish Hawk, O.N. 652535, Kaktovik II, O.N. 623509, Logistics Provider, O.N. 645121, Madison Rose, O.N. 274325, Sea Hawk, O.N. 597336, Takotna River O.N. 1159276.. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Marine Lenders Services LLC appointed. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/22/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Clerk to issue warrant.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/22/23. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 22, 2023 WARRANT of Arrest In Rem issued as to Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106, Fish Hawk, O.N. 652535, Kaktovik II, O.N. 623509, Logistics Provider, O.N. 645121, Madison Rose, O.N. 274325, Sea Hawk, O.N. 597336, Takotna River O.N. 1159276. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 16, 2023 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Buck Fowler re #5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Banner Bank. (Darling, Lafcadio)
June 16, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Banner Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Darling, Lafcadio)
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Banner Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Writ)(Darling, Lafcadio)
June 9, 2023 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Alaska Logistics, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant A. Long)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Casperson, John)
June 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint to Foreclose Preferred Ship Mortgages In Rem, And Complaint For Breach of Contract/ Promissory Note, Breach of Guaranty and For Replevin/Turnover of Collateral against Alaska Logistics, LLC, Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106, Fish Hawk, O.N. 652535, Kaktovik II, O.N. 623509, Logistics Provider, O.N. 645121, Allyn Long, Madison Rose, O.N. 274325, Sea Hawk, O.N. 597336, Takotna River O.N. 1159276 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3451261.), filed by Banner Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note 0616, #2 Exhibit B - First Preferred Fleet Mortgage of Vessel 0616, #3 Exhibit C - Security Agreement 0616, #4 Exhibit D - Note 0650, #5 Exhibit E - First Preferred Fleet Mortgage of Vessel 0650, #6 Exhibit F - Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Note 6329, #8 Exhibit H - Security Agreement 6329, #9 Exhibit I - Note 6431, #10 Exhibit J - Security Agreement 6431, #11 Exhibit K - Note 0593, #12 Exhibit L - Second Prefered Fleet Mortgage of Vessel 0593, #13 Exhibit M - Security Agreement 0593, #14 Exhibit N - Pledge Agreement 4662, #15 Exhibit O - BLA 0593, #16 Exhibit P - Guaranty 0650, #17 Unissued Summons re Defendant Summons to Alaska Logistics, LLC, #18 Unissued Summons re Defendant Summons to Allyn Long)(Casperson, John)
June 9, 2023 Summons Issued as to Alaska Logistics, LLC, and Allyn Long. (LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banner Bank v. Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banner Bank
Represented By: Lafcadio H. Darling
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittney Moe, O.N. 176106
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish Hawk, O.N. 652535
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaktovik II, O.N. 623509
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logistics Provider, O.N. 645121
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Rose, O.N. 274325
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Hawk, O.N. 597336
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takotna River O.N. 1159276
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyn Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?