Fog Marine, LLC v. Resolve Marine Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fog Marine, LLC
Defendant: Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., Resolve Marine Group, Inc., Resolve Equipment Inc., Resolve-Magone Marine Services (Alaska), Inc. and N C Power Systems Co.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00141
Filed: June 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fog Marine, LLC. (Buhler, Michelle)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/11/2023. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2023 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., Resolve Equipment Inc., Resolve Marine Group, Inc.. (Baxter, Lee)
August 11, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., Resolve Equipment Inc., Resolve Marine Group, Inc..(Baxter, Lee)
August 10, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by N C Power Systems Co.. (Reilly, Chris)
August 10, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by N C Power Systems Co..(Reilly, Chris)
July 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris P. Reilly on behalf of N C Power Systems Co. (Reilly, Chris)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: Resolve Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint at Docket #8 is GRANTED. The Answer shall be filed no later than August 16, 2023. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., Resolve Equipment Inc., Resolve Marine Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baxter, Lee)
July 25, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Colin Baxter on behalf of Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., Resolve Equipment Inc., Resolve Marine Group, Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
July 7, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fog Marine, LLC. Resolve Marine Group, Inc. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Buhler, Michelle)
July 7, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fog Marine, LLC. Resolve Equipment Inc. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Buhler, Michelle)
July 7, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fog Marine, LLC. Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Buhler, Michelle)
July 7, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fog Marine, LLC. N C Power Systems Co. served on 7/5/2023, answer due 7/26/2023. (Buhler, Michelle)
June 30, 2023 Filing 2 Unissued summons re Defendant Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., (Attachments: #1 N C Power Systems Co., #2 Resolve Equipment, Inc, #3 Resolve Marine Group, Inc)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3461417.), filed by Fog Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant NC Power, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Resolve AK Hold., #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Resolve Equip., #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Resolve Marine)(Buhler, Michelle)
June 30, 2023 Summons Issued as to N C Power Systems Co., Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc., Resolve Equipment Inc., Resolve Marine Group, Inc. (LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fog Marine, LLC v. Resolve Marine Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolve Alaska Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolve Marine Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolve Equipment Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolve-Magone Marine Services (Alaska), Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N C Power Systems Co.
Represented By: Chris P. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fog Marine, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Jordan
Represented By: Michelle Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?