Robinson v. State of Alaska, DHSS, BCP, SDS et al
Plaintiff: Elias Steve Robinson
Defendant: State of Alaska, DHSS, BCP, SDS, Jennifer Tillman and Conduent of Fair Hearing's DHSS
Case Number: 3:2023cv00217
Filed: September 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Elias Steve Robinson re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANTS Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/26/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elias Steve Robinson.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conduent of Fair Hearing's DHSS, State of Alaska, DHSS, BCP, SDS, Jennifer Tillman, filed by Elias Steve Robinson. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. State of Alaska, DHSS, BCP, SDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Steve Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska, DHSS, BCP, SDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conduent of Fair Hearing's DHSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?