The State of Alaska v. Express Scripts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The State of Alaska
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Medco Health Solutions, ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. and Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00233
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE re #27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher George Michel, at docket #27 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (SCD, COURT STAFF)
December 1, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions.(Gardner, Eva)
November 29, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher George Michel. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3530953.) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions.(Gardner, Eva)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 11/15/2023. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
November 14, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule Unopposed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Set Briefing Schedule)(Gardner, Eva)
November 7, 2023 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE re #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Smith, at docket #20 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (SCD, COURT STAFF)
November 7, 2023 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE re #19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Linda Singer, at docket #19 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (SCD, COURT STAFF)
November 7, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Elizabeth Smith. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3522174.) by The State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Gross, David)
November 7, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Linda Singer. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3522170.) by The State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Gross, David)
November 6, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by The State of Alaska. Amendment to 17 SEALED MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL REDACTED AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Gross, David)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 10/30/2023. (SCD, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/30/2023 to chg security and generate NEF. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Compliance with Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions re #4 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Gardner, Eva)
October 26, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #11 and #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Gordan Cooper and Michael John Lyle, at dockets #11 and #12 is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (SCD, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Michael John Lyle. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3514030.) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions.(Gardner, Eva)
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jonathan Gordan Cooper. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3514019.) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions.(Gardner, Eva)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE LIST /RESPONSE TO ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions. (Gardner, Eva) Modified on 10/23/2023 to clarify text. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 JMK TEXT ORDER: The Parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Move to Remand at Docket #8 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended by 21 days. Additionally, Plaintiff's deadline to move to remand is extended by 21 days. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and to Move to Remand by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and Move to Remand)(Gardner, Eva)
October 13, 2023 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B (SEALED), #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gardner, Eva) Modified on 10/17/2023 to modify text and unseal document except for Exhibit B per counsel. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
October 13, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions (Gardner, Eva)
October 13, 2023 Filing 5 HRH TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is administratively reassigned to the Honorable Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:23-cv-00233-JMK. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions. (Gardner, Eva)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Gardner, Eva)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Medco Health Solutions, Express Scripts, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. from Superior Court of the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District in Anchorage, case number 3AN-23-08083CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3507081), filed by Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Medco Health Solutions, Express Scripts, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gardner, Eva)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Alaska v. Express Scripts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alaska
Represented By: David Karl Gross
Represented By: Mara Elizabeth Michaletz
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Represented By: Linda Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Eva Rivka Gardner
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Christopher Michel
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators, LLC
Represented By: Eva Rivka Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Michel
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions
Represented By: Eva Rivka Gardner
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Represented By: Christopher Michel
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Eva Rivka Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Michel
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Eva Rivka Gardner
Represented By: Christopher Michel
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Michael John Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?