Greist v. The Progressive Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Greist
Defendant: The Progressive Corporation, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, John Doe Corporations and Business Entities 1-10, Progressive Advantage Agency, Inc, John Doe Subsidiaries of the Progressive Corporation 1-10 and John Doe Local Progressive Agency and John Doe Local Agent
Case Number: 3:2023cv00235
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE RE: OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL by Kathleen Greist re #22 MOTION to Remand OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (28 U.S. CODE 1447(c)) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1, #23 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 27, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (28 U.S. CODE 1447(c)) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1 filed by John Doe Corporations and Business Entities 1-10, John Doe Local Progressive Agency and John Doe Local Agent, John Doe Subsidiaries of the Progressive Corporation 1-10, Progressive Advantage Agency, Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Crabb, Kristin)
November 27, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (28 U.S. CODE 1447(c)) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1 by Kathleen Greist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 22, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Leave to File [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1 filed by John Doe Corporations and Business Entities 1-10, John Doe Local Progressive Agency and John Doe Local Agent, John Doe Subsidiaries of the Progressive Corporation 1-10, Progressive Advantage Agency, Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crabb, Kristin)
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by John Doe Corporations and Business Entities 1-10, John Doe Local Progressive Agency and John Doe Local Agent, John Doe Subsidiaries of the Progressive Corporation 1-10, Progressive Advantage Agency, Inc, Progressive Specialty Insurance Company, The Progressive Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crabb, Kristin)
November 22, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Immediate Action Needed: Your recent electronic filing with the District of Alaska is in error: #12 Notice (Other) filed by Kathleen Greist Combined Documents are not allowed. [SEE L.Civ.R. 7.1(e) and 5.1(f)(2)].ACTION NEEDED: Attorney to re-file the portion Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction using the event Motion. Once motion has been re-filed, respsonses due as soon as practicable. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
November 9, 2023 Filing 19 JMK TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion at Docket #11 is GRANTED. The deadline for the parties to file their Initial Scheduling and Planning Conference Report is hereby STAYED pending the Court's decision regarding Plaintiff's filings at Dockets #12 through #18 .(SCD, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kathleen Greist re #14 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 8, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Hearing re #13 MOTION for Leave to File [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1, #12 Notice (Other), #15 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FURTHER AMENDED COMPLAINT ONCE NAME(S) OF LOCAL ALASKA PROGRESSIVE DEFENDANTS/CITIZENS OF ALASKA ARE REVEALED ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1, #16 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL, #14 Amended Complaint by Kathleen Greist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 8, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL by Kathleen Greist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 8, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FURTHER AMENDED COMPLAINT ONCE NAME(S) OF LOCAL ALASKA PROGRESSIVE DEFENDANTS/CITIZENS OF ALASKA ARE REVEALED ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1 by Kathleen Greist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kathleen Greist.(Weidner, Phillip)
November 8, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1 by Kathleen Greist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (28 U.S. CODE 1447(c)) ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED UNDER LOCAL RULE 7.1 by Kathleen Greist re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
November 7, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION TO CONTINUE DUE DATE FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT by Kathleen Greist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weidner, Phillip)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company. (Crabb, Kristin)
October 26, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company (Crabb, Kristin)
October 26, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company (Crabb, Kristin)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 10/24/2023. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Crabb, Kristin)
October 16, 2023 Filing 5 HRH TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is administratively reassigned to the Honorable Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:23-cv-00235-JMK. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Crabb, Kristin)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Crabb, Kristin)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Anchorage Superior Court, case number 3AN-23-05257CI. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3507562), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 State Notice re Removal)(Crabb, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greist v. The Progressive Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Greist
Represented By: Phillip Paul Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Progressive Corporation
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations and Business Entities 1-10
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Advantage Agency, Inc
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Subsidiaries of the Progressive Corporation 1-10
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Local Progressive Agency and John Doe Local Agent
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?