Young-God v. Lyou et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Young-God
Defendant: Chris Lyou and Michael Guzy
Case Number: 3:2023cv00273
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Muhammad Young-God (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL RIGHTS CASES FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED PRISONERS Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/19/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
December 19, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of the Suit is changed to 555 to reflect that this is a Prisoner Civil Rights Action. This change is administrative in nature only. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 Amended Motion re #1 Complaint, by Muhammad Young-God.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Chris Lyou, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michael Guzy)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Intent to Proceed Without Counsel by Muhammad Young-God (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Muhammad Young-God. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Guzy, Chris Lyou, filed by Muhammad Young-God. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young-God v. Lyou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Young-God
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Lyou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Guzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?