Evans v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Theresa Evans
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Martin J. O'Malley
Case Number: 3:2023cv00276
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Lodging Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 001 Certification Page, #2 002 Court Transcript Index, #3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 1, #4 004 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 2, #5 005 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable Part 3, #6 006 Payment Documents and Decisions, #7 007 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #8 008 Non Disability Related Development, #9 009 Disability Related Development, #10 010 Medical Records Part 1, #11 011 Medical Records Part 2)(Becia, Franco)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to refund the $250.00 pro hac vice admission fee paid by attorney Christopher H. Dellert pursuant to L.Civ.R.83.1(e)(3). Defendant to file Answer/Response/Administrative Record w/in 60 days of the filing of complaint; parties to file their briefs w/in 30 days; reply due w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 12/28/2023. cc: Finance (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 28, 2023 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #7 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher H. Dellert, at docket #4 , is authorized under L.Civ.R. 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2023 Docket Annotation: Martin J. O'Malley, Commissioner of Social Security substituted for Kilolo Kijakazi (Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration) pursuant to FRCvP 25(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Becia, Franco)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher H. Dellert. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $250.00 paid. Receipt number AAKDC-3535972.) by Theresa Evans. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dellert, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Theresa Evans.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Theresa Evans.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Evans
Represented By: Christopher H. Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Marie Constance Scheperle
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Represented By: Franco Luciano Becia
Represented By: Marie Constance Scheperle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?