Mute v. State of Alaska

Plaintiff: Stanley J. Mute
Defendant: State of Alaska
Case Number: 4:2008cv00010
Filed: April 15, 2008
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Ralph R. Beistline
Referring Judge: Deborah M. Smith
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus at Docket 45 and Denying Motion for Evidentiary Hearing at Docket 133 . (JPS, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 15, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court Report and Recommendation
October 4, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Motion to Dismiss at Docket 58 . (Jan, Chambers Staff)
June 16, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court Report and Recommendation

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mute v. State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley J. Mute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?