Steffensen v. City of Fairbanks et al

Plaintiff: Frank Steffensen
Defendant: City of Fairbanks, Ron Dupree, Avery Thompson, John Merrion, Burlyn Rigdon, Lewis, Alaska Department of Corrections, Probation Department, Bill Nyfeler, Mike Foran, Eric Cohoon, Lesia Lefner and Casey Mayhew
Case Number: 4:2009cv00004
Filed: February 10, 2009
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Fairbanks Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: John W. Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND REQUEST THAT COURT ACCEPT RESUBMITTED, SIGNED OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO R. 11(a), granting in part and denying in part 109 MOTION for Reconsideration re 100 Judgment, and denying 110 MOTION to accept resubmitted, signed opposition to motion to dismiss pursuant to R. 11(a). Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 1/26/10. (Lemm, J.)
January 5, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT KASEY MAYHEWS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant Kasey Mayhew's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 95 ) is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 1/5/10. (Lemm, J.)
June 24, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM STATE ACTORS, denying 55 MOTION to Compel filed by Frank Steffensen. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 6/24/09. (Lemm, J.)
June 1, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Burlyn Rigdon, City of Fairbanks, Officer Stewart Lewis, John Merrion, Ron Dupee. It is hereby ORDERED that the court will proceed with this case while plaintiff's appeal is pendi ng. Defendants' Motion to Reschedule Trial Date (Dkt. 39 ) is GRANTED. The dates set in the scheduling order issued on March 31, 2009 (Dkt. 32 ) are STRICKEN. The court will issue a minute order requiring a joint status report that complies with the requirements of Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f). Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 6/1/09. (Lemm, J.)
March 24, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 3/24/09. (Lemm, J.)
March 10, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct; 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer & 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Mr. Steffensen's motion to amend his complaint (Doc. 9 ) is GRANTED. The initial complaint is, therefore, d ismissed, and the amended complaint must be filed on or before April 20, 2009. Mr. Steffensen's motion for U.S. Marshal service upon certain defendants (Doc. 9 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal, if necessary, after the filing of his amended complaint. The defendants' motions (Doc. 8 and 10 ) are DENIED as moot, but may be renewed as appropriate, after the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan on 3/10/09. (Lemm, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steffensen v. City of Fairbanks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Steffensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fairbanks
Represented By: Frank S. Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Dupree
Represented By: Frank S. Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Thompson
Represented By: Frank S. Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Merrion
Represented By: Frank S. Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlyn Rigdon
Represented By: Frank S. Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis
Represented By: Frank S. Koziol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Nyfeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Foran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Cohoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesia Lefner
Represented By: Stephanie G. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Mayhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?