Seavey v. KAI, USA, Ltd. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mitchell Seavey
Defendant: KAI, USA, Ltd. and Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv00001
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Fairbanks Office
County: Fairbanks
Presiding Judge: Ralph R. Beistline
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2012 15 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER.(Jan, Chambers Staff)
March 1, 2012 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ingaldson, William)
February 2, 2012 13 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 3/1/2012. (LSC, COURT STAFF)
February 2, 2012 12 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by KAI, USA, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ducey, Cynthia)
February 2, 2012 11 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by KAI, USA, Ltd. (Ducey, Cynthia)
January 26, 2012 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Tiemessen on behalf of Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. (Tiemessen, John)
January 26, 2012 9 NOTICE of Demand for Trial by Jury by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc. (Tiemessen, John)
January 26, 2012 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc..(Tiemessen, John)
January 24, 2012 7 ANSWER to Complaint by KAI, USA, Ltd..(Ducey, Cynthia)
January 24, 2012 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KAI, USA, Ltd.. (Ducey, Cynthia)
January 24, 2012 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia L. Ducey on behalf of KAI, USA, Ltd. (Ducey, Cynthia)
January 23, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (JAE, COURTSTAFF)
January 23, 2012 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KAI, USA, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent KAI Corporation of Tokyo, Japan, Corporate Parent KAI Industries Company, Ltd. Gifu, Japan for KAI, USA, Ltd... (JAE, COURTSTAFF)
January 23, 2012 2 Civil Cover Sheet (JAE, COURTSTAFF)
January 23, 2012 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KAI, USA, Ltd. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Bethel, case number 4BE-11-513CI. ( Filing fee $ 350 Receipt #ANC005126) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Written Consent for Removal, # 3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice)(JAE, COURTSTAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seavey v. KAI, USA, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAI, USA, Ltd.
Represented By: Cynthia L. Ducey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportsman's Warehouse, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Tiemessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Seavey
Represented By: William H. Ingaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?