ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Merdes & Merdes, P.C. et al

Plaintiff: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Merdes & Merdes, P.C., Merdes Law Office, P.C. and Ward M. Merdes
Case Number: 4:2014cv00002
Filed: August 1, 2013
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Fairbanks Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting Motion to Stay filing of ALP'S answer 128 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 06/16/2016. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 27, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: is hereby entered, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 54(b) and 58, in favor of Defendants Merdes & Merdes, P.C. and Ward M. Merdes with respect to ALPS's claim for declaratory relief. (See Judgment for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/27/2015. (CME, COURT STAFF)
December 29, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Motion for Summary Judgment 35 . A scheduling conference to establish a trial date and associated pretrial deadlines shall be held on February 25, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. in the Fairbanks Courtroom using Meet-me Line Bridge B for telephonic participation. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/29/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Main Document 56 replaced on 12/29/2014 and date corrected in text. NEF regenerated) (CME, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Merdes & Merdes, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kendra Bowman
Represented By: Kevin D. Hartzell
Represented By: Angela Probasco
Represented By: Clay A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merdes & Merdes, P.C.
Represented By: Brad S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merdes Law Office, P.C.
Represented By: Brad S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward M. Merdes
Represented By: Brad S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?