Tangwall v. Compton

In Re: Margaret A. Bertran
Appellant: Barbara Tangwall
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Case Number: 4:2018cv00026
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Fairbanks Office
County: Fairbanks
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2018 7 USBC CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF READINESS (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2018 6 [PLEASE DISREGARD]CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC Appeal Number. cc: Bankruptcy Court (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/30/2018 to disregard docket entry. Document has been filed in the correct case.(PXS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2018 5 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely re #4 filed by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely by Larry D. Compton.(Christianson, Cabot)
July 31, 2018 3 Notice of copy of Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs received from Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (DCH, COURT STAFF)
July 17, 2018 2 CLERK'S NOTICE of USDC Appeal Number. cc: Bankruptcy Court (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 17, 2018 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number F12-00501-FC. File received, filed by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal and Transmittal of Appeal to District Court, #2 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #3 Notice of Requirements for Perfection of Appeal and of Appellant's Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court, #4 Pro Se Appellants Instructions, #5 BAP Docket Sheet)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall v. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Margaret A. Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Represented By: Cabot C. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?