Tangwall v. Compton
Appellant: Donald Tangwall
In Re: Margaret A. Bertran
Appellee: Barbara Wackers, William Wackers and Larry D. Compton
Case Number: 4:2018cv00031
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: granting #4 Motion to Waive Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/23/2018. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2018 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as noticed at docket #6 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING: The appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of this notice. (See Order). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Clerk's Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 USBC Clerk's Records on Appeal)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 4:18-cv-00031-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC Appeal Number. cc: Bankruptcy Court (PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Application to Waive Filing Fee by Donald Tangwall.(CME, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number F12-00501-FC. File received, filed by Donald Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice of FIling of Notice of Appeal and Transmittal of Appeal to District Court, #2 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #3 Amended Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #4 Notice of Requirements for Perfection of Appeal and of Appellant's Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court, #5 Pro Se Appellants Instructions, #6 Application to Waive Filing Fee, #7 USBC Docket Sheet)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall v. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Margaret A. Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barbara Wackers
Represented By: Erik LeRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Wackers
Represented By: Erik LeRoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Represented By: Cabot C. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?