Wollman et al v. Lithia Motors, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Kelsea Wollman and Anne Revermann
Defendant: Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching and Lithia Motors, INC.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00035
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 TMB TEXT ORDER re #9 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration. In light of the agreement of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is STAYED to permit the parties to enter into arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before 3/29/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings in Favor of Arbitration by Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, Lithia Motors, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Jessica)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, Lithia Motors, INC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(Singer, Matthew)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lithia Motors, INC.. (Singer, Matthew)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, Lithia Motors, INC. (Singer, Matthew)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Of Removal to Adverse Party by Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, and Lithia Motors, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Limited Entry of Appearance by Jessica M.Y. Brown and Matthew Singer on behalf of Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, and Lithia Motors, INC. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, Lithia Motors, INC. from Superior Court State of AK. Fourth Judicial District at Fairbanks, case number 4FA-18-02113CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC015065), filed by Jacob Baldridge, Henry Ching, Lithia Motors, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wollman et al v. Lithia Motors, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Baldridge
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Jessica M.Y. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ching
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Jessica M.Y. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lithia Motors, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Jessica M.Y. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsea Wollman
Represented By: Brad S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Revermann
Represented By: Brad S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?