Donnellan et al v. Denali Bancorporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Tangwall and Barry Donnellan
Defendant: Denali Bancorporation, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00008
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/16/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/16/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Denali Bancorporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crabb, Kristin)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (RMC, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Denali Bancorporation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proposed Order)(Crabb, Kristin)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Denali Bancorporation, Inc., filed by Barry Donnellan and Donald Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Denali Bancorporation, Inc. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Denali Bancorporation (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Denali Bancorporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400., Receipt #FBK00001719), filed by Barry Donnellan, Donald Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnellan et al v. Denali Bancorporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Donnellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denali Bancorporation, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin E. Crabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?