Tangwall v. Buscher et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Tangwall
Defendant: George E. Buscher, Lois L. Buscher, Russell Smith, Zimmerman and Wallace, 49th Cartridge Company, LLC, Christopher E. Zimmerman and David Dwyer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00011
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Matthew McCrary Scoble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to B. Tangwall re #12 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Reconsideration by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. THAT the Complaint at Docket #1 and the Amended Complaint at Docket #7 are hereby DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MMS ORDER: Complaint re #1 and Amended Complaint re #7 are hereby DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble on 6/10/2019. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to 49th Cartridge Company, LLC, David Dwyer, Russell Smith, Christopher E. Zimmerman, Zimmerman and Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Dwyer, #2 Smith, #3 Zimmerman and Wallace, #4 Zimmerman)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unissued summons re Defendant R. Smith, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant 49th Cartridge Co, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Dwyer, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmerman and Wallace, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmerman)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against George E. Buscher, Lois L. Buscher, Zimmerman and Wallace, Christopher E. Zimmerman, 49th Cartridge Company, LLC, David Dwyer, Russell Smith, filed by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Tangwall. George E. Buscher served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Tangwall. Lois L. Buscher served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to George E. Buscher and Lois L. Buscher. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2019 Receipt number FBK001755 in the amount of $ 400.00 received on 6/4/19 from D. Tangwall regarding Civil Filing Fee. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/6/2019. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant G. Buscher, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant L. Buscher)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Barbara Tangwall.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George E. Buscher and Lois L. Buscher, filed by Barbara Tangwall. Receipt# FBK001755 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/4/2019 to add receipt number (LMH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall v. Buscher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George E. Buscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois L. Buscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmerman and Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 49th Cartridge Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher E. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?