City of Fairbanks, Alaska v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: City of Fairbanks, Alaska
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP and 3M Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00013
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in AK/4:19-cv-00013, 425 in MDL No. 2873) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case is transferred to the District of South Carolina for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/7/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Madonna, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Warren Head, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant 3M Company, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Tyco Fire Products LP)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Kevin J. Madonna. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2690295.) by City of Fairbanks, Alaska.(Head, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Richard W. Head. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2690258.) by City of Fairbanks, Alaska.(Head, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Head, Richard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2690244.), filed by City of Fairbanks, Alaska.(Head, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fairbanks, Alaska v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fairbanks, Alaska
Represented By: Danielle Sibener Pensley
Represented By: Richard Warren Head
Represented By: Paul J. Ewers
Represented By: Kevin J. Madonna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?