Nelson v. Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Eric Darnell Nelson
Defendant: Investigator Rupe, Department of Corrections and Amber Doty
Case Number: 4:2019cv00014
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Matthew McCrary Scoble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE: This matter is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 4:19-cv-00016-RRB. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Eric Darnell Nelson.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 30, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/21/2019. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER'S COMPLAINT UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Department of Corrections, Amber Doty, and Investigator Rupe, filed by Eric Darnell Nelson.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Darnell Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investigator Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?