Nicori v. Dolstram
Plaintiff: Matthew James Nicori
Defendant: Nancy Dolstram
Case Number: 4:2019cv00029
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Matthew McCrary Scoble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court adopts the Final Report and Recommendation. The Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28:2241 is DENIED. A certificate of appealability will not be issued by this Court. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/7/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus re #1 . The U.S. Magistrate Judge recommends the Petition #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by close of business on 10/24/2019 ; Reply to Objections to R&R due by close of business on 10/31/2019. Clerk of Court to mail this Final Report and Recommendation and forms PS01 & PS10 to Mr. Nicori. Signed by Judge Matthew McCrary Scoble on 10/10/2019. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Application to Waive Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Matthew James Nicori. (Attachments: #1 Account Statements)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Matthew James Nicori.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicori v. Dolstram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Dolstram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew James Nicori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?