Tangwall v. Compton
Appellant: Barbara Tangwall
In Re: In re: Margaret A. Bertran
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00036
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 Brief in Support Motion to Recuse Judge Gleason by Barbara Tangwall re #7 MOTION for Recusal (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The motion to recuse, at docket #7 , is DENIED. The motion to dismiss, at docket #9 , is GRANTED and this appeal is DISMISSED as untimely. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Objection to Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely filed by Barbara Tangwall. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (LMH, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/19/2019 to add correct document and regenerate(LMH, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal as Untimely by Larry D. Compton.(Christianson, Cabot)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry D. Compton. (Christianson, Cabot)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Recuse Judge Gleason by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Correct Docket and to Rule on Special Appearance of Barbara Tangwall #4 Notice (Other) by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Barbara Tangwall (LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Objection to the standing of Larry D. Compton by Barbara Tangwall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Barbara Tangwall.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC Appeal Number. cc: Bankruptcy Court (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/27/2019 to correct filed date (LMH, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BAP No. AK-19-1285 Bk. No. 12-00501. File received, filed by Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal and Transmittal of Appeal to BAP, #2 Order of Transferring Appeal to U.S. District Court, #3 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, #4 Appellee's Statement of Election)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/27/2019 to correct filed date(LMH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall v. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Barbara Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In re: Margaret A. Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Larry D. Compton
Represented By: Cabot C. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?