Eyre v. The City of Fairbanks et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Eyre
Defendant: Christine Joslin, The City of Fairbanks, Richard Sweet, Nathaniel Johnson, Tyler Larimer, State of Alaska, Elondre Johnson and James Thomas, III
Case Number: 4:2019cv00038
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER FROM CHAMBERS: Proof of service as to one or more defendants is lacking. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service is to be accomplished within 90 days from the filing of the complaint. File proofs of service on those defendants already served. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Elondre Johnson, Nathaniel Johnson, Christine Joslin, Tyler Larimer, State of Alaska, Richard Sweet, The City of Fairbanks, James Thomas, III. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant The City of Fairbanks, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General Kevin Clarkson, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant R. Sweet, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant T. Larimer, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant E. Johnson, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant N. Johnson, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant J. Thomas, #7 Unissued Summons re Defendant C. Joslin)(BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Choate, Mark)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 4:19-cv-00038-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2796034.), filed by Kyle Eyre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Choate, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eyre v. The City of Fairbanks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Joslin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Larimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elondre Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Eyre
Represented By: Mark C. Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?