Tangwall v. Compton
Appellant: Donald Tangwall
In Re: Margaret A. Bertran
Trustee: Larry D. Compton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00041
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT EXPLAINING WHY THE APPEAL IS NOT FRIVOLOUS AND SHOULD GO FORWARD by Donald Tangwall re #4 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to M. Bertran re #4 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 USBC CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF READINESS (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal, #2 Notice of Recipients)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS: Motion to dismiss this appeal or statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should not go forward due within 28 days. The motion to waive the filing fee, at docket #2 , is deferred. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/3/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC Appeal Number. cc: Bankruptcy Court. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Donald Tangwall.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number BAP No. AK-19-1315, Bk. No. 12-00501. File received, filed by Donald Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal and Transmittal of Appeal to BAP, #2 Transmittal Form, #3 Notice of Transfer, #4 Notice of Appeal, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall v. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Donald Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Margaret A. Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Larry D. Compton
Represented By: Cabot C. Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?