Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
Plaintiff: Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00017
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Anthony J. Monaco. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2886781.) Plaintiff's Non-Opposition filed by Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc. (Welch, Amy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony J. Monaco, at docket #10 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Anthony J. Monaco. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2886781.) by Rust-Oleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Thorsness, John)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PLANNING REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report as soon as possible, but not later than 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc. Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Welch, Amy)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Thorsness on behalf of Rust-Oleum Corporation (Thorsness, John)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/12/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to Rust-Oleum Corporation. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Rust-Oleum Corporation, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance by Amy Kate Welch on behalf of Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rust-Oleum Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 - FBK001397.), filed by Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc v. Rust-Oleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rust-Oleum Corporation
Represented By: Anthony J. Monaco
Represented By: John B. Thorsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polar Environmental Technologies, Inc
Represented By: Amy Kate Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?