White v. Saul
Plaintiff: Yolanda White
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00031
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda White. Andrew M. Saul served on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Eaglin, Paul)
September 4, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #7 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/4/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
August 28, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: Application to Waive File Fee at Docket #3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court to issue summons. Defendant to file Answer/Response w/in 60 days. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/28/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant AG, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Regional Chief Counsel)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Yolanda White.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Yolanda White.(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda White
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?