Tangwall et al v. Satterberg et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Tangwall and Donna Uphues
Defendant: George E. Boscher, William R. Satterberg, Jr., Paul R. Lyle, Brent E. Bennett, Lois L. Buscher, Amy K Welch, George E. Buscher, Ruth Meier, Zimmerman & Wallace, PC, Amy K. Welch and Christopher Zimmerman
Case Number: 4:2020cv00040
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed documents received 1/23/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/27/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed documents received 1/22/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/26/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 22, 2021 Filing 38 ERROR- DISREGARD USCA Scheduling Order as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Tangwall, Donna Uphues. Skipworth, (BJK, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/27/2021 to reflect erorr. Entered into wrong case. Error has been fixed. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2021 Filing 37 Entered in Error - Disregard - USCA Case Number for #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Tangwall, Donna Uphues. (BJK, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/27/2021 to reflect error. Entered into Incorrect case. Error has been fixed. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2021 Filing 36 USCA Scheduling Order as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Tangwall, Donna Uphues. 21-35049 Appellants Barbara Tangwall and Donna Uphues opening brief due 03/22/2021. Appellees Brent E. Bennett, George E. Buscher, Lois L. Buscher, Paul R. Lyle, Ruth Meier, William R. Satterberg Jr., Amy K. Welch, Christopher Zimmerman and Zimmerman & Wallace, PC answering brief due 04/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2021 Filing 35 USCA Case Number 21-35049 for #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Barbara Tangwall, Donna Uphues. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed documents received 1/20/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/20/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed documents received 1/15/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/20/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed documents received 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/20/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/14/2021. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 14, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order by Barbara Tangwall, Donna Uphues. (No Fee Provided) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed documents received 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/13/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed Motion for Clarification received 1/07/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/13/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed Motion for Clarification received 1/08/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/12/21. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
January 7, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss , #11 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Bennett & Lyle filed by Brent E. Bennett, Paul R. Lyle, Ruth Meier. (West, Susan)
January 5, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE Notice of No Intent to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motions to Dismiss by William R. Satterberg, Jr, Amy K. Welch (Welch, Amy) Modified on 1/8/2021 to link to dkt 13 (JLH, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of No Intent to Reply by George E. Buscher, Lois L. Buscher, Christopher Zimmerman, Zimmerman & Wallace, PC re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Zimmerman, Christopher) Modified on 1/5/2021 to link to dkt 10 (JLH, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed NOTICE received 12/30/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/31/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed Entry of Default received 12/29/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/30/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment received 12/30/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/30/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Bennett & Lyle, #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Satterberg and Welch, and #15 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Barbara Tangwall, Donna Uphues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit AA, #3 Exhibit AAA, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING FILING OF RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS: The Court will accept the filing of the proposed Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/30/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE ATTEMPTED FILING: The Court disapproves and denies the filing of the proposed Motion for Reconsideration received on 12/17/2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/29/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Ruth Meier #15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ruth Meier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(West, Susan)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Ruth Meier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(West, Susan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Satterberg and Welch by William R. Satterberg, Jr, Amy K. Welch #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Satterberg and Welch filed by William R. Satterberg, Jr., Amy K. Welch. (Welch, Amy)
December 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Satterberg and Welch by William R. Satterberg, Jr, Amy K. Welch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Welch, Amy)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Bennett & Lyle by Brent E. Bennett, Paul R. Lyle #11 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Bennett & Lyle filed by Paul R. Lyle, Brent E. Bennett. (West, Susan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants Bennett & Lyle by Brent E. Bennett, Paul R. Lyle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(West, Susan)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by George E. Buscher, Lois L. Buscher, Christopher Zimmerman, Zimmerman & Wallace, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit Presiding Judge's Screening Order,11-7-2018, #4 Exhibit Complaint for Forcible Entry and Detainer, 5-20-2019, #5 Exhibit Order of Remand, 6-14-2019, #6 Exhibit Minute Order from Chambers Regarding Screening Order Violations, 10-7-2020, #7 Exhibit Order on Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, 10-17-2020, #8 Exhibit Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment to Plaintiffs, 12-2-2020, #9 Exhibit Vexatious Litigant Order and Order of Dismissal, 10-3-2018)(Zimmerman, Christopher)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S FILING: #8 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 12/15/20. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 *STRICKEN* MOTION to Recuse Judge Sharon Gleason by Barbara Tangwall and Donna Uphues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Caveat)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/15/2020 to add stricken per the order at docket #9 (LMH, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Uphues, Barbara Tangwall. Ruth Meier served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Christopher Zimmerman served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020; Zimmerman & Wallace, PC served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2020 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant R. Meier, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant C. Zimmerman, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmerman and Wallace)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS, DENYING ACCESS TO THE COURTS AND INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL STRESS against Brent E. Bennett, George E. Buscher, Lois L. Buscher, Paul R. Lyle, Ruth Meier, William R. Satterberg, Jr, Amy K. Welch, Christopher Zimmerman, Zimmerman & Wallace, PC, filed by Donna Uphues, Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ruth Meier, Christopher Zimmerman, Zimmerman & Wallace, PC. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Uphues, Barbara Tangwall. Brent E. Bennett served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020; Lois L. Buscher served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020; Paul R. Lyle served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020; William R. Satterberg, Jr served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return, #3 Summons Return, #4 Summons Return, #5 Summons Return)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant B. Bennett, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Buscher, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant L. Buscher, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Lyle, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Satterberg, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant Welch)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brent E. Bennett, George E. Boscher, Lois L. Buscher, Paul R. Lyle, William R. Satterberg, Jr, Amy K Welch (Filing fee $ 400 Receipt# AKDCLERK21-0003), filed by Donna Uphues, Barbara Tangwall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to Brent E. Bennett, George E. Boscher, Lois L. Buscher, Paul R. Lyle, William R. Satterberg, Jr, Amy K Welch. (LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tangwall et al v. Satterberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George E. Boscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Satterberg, Jr.
Represented By: Amy Kate Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Lyle
Represented By: Susan M. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent E. Bennett
Represented By: Susan M. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois L. Buscher
Represented By: Christopher E. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy K Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George E. Buscher
Represented By: Christopher E. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Meier
Represented By: Susan M. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmerman & Wallace, PC
Represented By: Christopher E. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy K. Welch
Represented By: Amy Kate Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Zimmerman
Represented By: Christopher E. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Tangwall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Uphues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?