Tufford v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marlena Tufford
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00042
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/22/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 22, 2021 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #9 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlena Tufford. Andrew M. Saul served on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt, #2 certified mail receipt)(Jones, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jones, Daniel)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Daniel S. Jones, at docket #4 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2020 Docket Annotation re Error: Civil Cover Sheet #2 filed in the wrong case.Correction: Attorney to re-file the correct Civil Cover Sheet. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel S. Jones. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2988148.) by Marlena Tufford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Andrew Saul, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jones, Daniel) Modified on 12/17/2020 to indicate error. See 12/17/2020 Docket Annotation (JLH, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 097--2988102.), filed by Marlena Tufford.(Jones, Daniel)
December 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tufford v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlena Tufford
Represented By: Daniel S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?